Multiply 26 x 37 and 36 x 27 using the column method and show your working.

Question

Multiply 26 x 37 and 36 x 27 using the column method and show your working.

in progress 0
Amaya 4 months 2021-09-24T22:05:19+00:00 2 Answers 0 views 0

Answers ( )

    0
    2021-09-24T22:06:45+00:00

    Answer:

    36 x 37 = 1332

    37×27 = 999

    0
    2021-09-24T22:07:03+00:00

    Answer:

    gxixicyychfuc choochi thermos crucial it ifugic if ivibkvl igud

    Step-by-step explanation:

    dhcucuivivoh

Leave an answer

Browse

14:4+1-6*5-7*14:3+5 = ? ( )